WI AB642 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 969.035 (1), 969.08 (2), 969.08 (5) (a) 2., 969.08 (5) (a) 3., 969.08 (5) (b) 3., 969.08 (5) (b) 5. and 969.08 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: pretrial detention and denial and revocation of release. (FE)
Title
Pretrial detention and denial and revocation of release. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:28 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2018-01-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Goyke |
2018-01-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke |
2017-12-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-30 | House | Representative Kremer added as a coauthor |
2017-11-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-11-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab642 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB642.pdf |