WI AB641 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.285 (1) (eg) and 36.25 (54); to amend 20.143 (1) (c), 20.143 (1) (d), 20.143 (1) (fi), 20.143 (1) (ie), 20.143 (1) (ig), 20.143 (1) (im), 20.143 (1) (io), 20.143 (1) (ir), 20.143 (1) (kj), 38.41 (3) (d), 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.21 (4), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10., 77.92 (4) and 560.205 (3) (d); and to create 20.285 (1) (cd), 20.285 (1) (eb), 20.285 (1) (eg), 36.25 (52), 36.25 (53), 36.25 (54), 71.07 (5r), 71.10 (4) (cd), 71.28 (5r), 71.30 (3) (cd), 71.47 (5r), 71.49 (1) (cd), 560.203, 560.27 (1) (c) and 560.276 of the statutes; relating to: a postsecondary education tax credit for businesses; increasing annual limits on angel investment tax credits; awarding grants to the WiSys Technology Foundation, Inc.; business plan competitions and an emerging technology center in the University of Wisconsin System; rural outsourcing grants; requiring the Department of Commerce to award grants to a high-technology business development corporation and grants for converting manufacturing facilities; increasing funding for certain economic development programs; a pilot program providing microloans for the creation of new businesses; increasing funding for certain technical college training program grants; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; granting rule-making authority; and making appropriations.
Title
A postsecondary education tax credit for businesses; increasing annual limits on angel investment tax credits; awarding grants to the WiSys Technology Foundation, Inc.; business plan competitions and an emerging technology center in the University of Wisconsin System; rural outsourcing grants; requiring the Department of Commerce to award grants to a high-technology business development corporation and grants for converting manufacturing facilities; increasing funding for certain economic development programs; a pilot program providing microloans for the creation of new businesses; increasing funding for certain technical college training program grants; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; granting rule-making authority; and making appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-12 | Assembly amendment 7 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Molepske Jr. | |
2010-04-08 | Assembly amendment 6 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Molepske Jr. | |
2010-04-07 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Molepske Jr. | |
2010-04-07 | Assembly amendment 5 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Molepske Jr. | |
2010-04-07 | Assembly amendment 4 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Molepske Jr. | |
2010-04-07 | Assembly amendment 3 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Molepske Jr. | |
2010-04-07 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Molepske Jr. | |
2010-04-06 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Molepske Jr. | |
2010-04-06 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Molepske Jr. | |
2010-02-03 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-26 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-19 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-19 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-04 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-04 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-12-28 | Read first time and referred to committee on Jobs, the Economy and Small Business | |
2009-12-28 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab641 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB641.pdf |