WI AB640 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.536 (1) (k) and 25.14 (1) (a) (intro.); and to create 19.42 (10) (t), 19.42 (13) (q), 20.192 (1) (t), 20.192 (1) (y), 25.17 (73), 25.90, 73.17 and subchapter III of chapter 238 [precedes 238.40] of the statutes; Relating to: creating the innovation fund and economic development programs funded by that fund, establishing the Innovation Fund Council, authorizing the State of Wisconsin Investment Board to provide certain advice and services to state agencies and others, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Creating the innovation fund and economic development programs funded by that fund, establishing the Innovation Fund Council, authorizing the State of Wisconsin Investment Board to provide certain advice and services to state agencies and others, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Small Business Development, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2018-03-22 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Small Business Development, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2018-03-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Small Business Development, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neylon |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sargent, Zamarripa, Billings, Kolste and Crowley |
2018-01-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sargent, Zamarripa, Billings, Kolste and Crowley |
2018-01-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neylon |
2017-12-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-13 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neylon |
2017-11-29 | House | LRB correction |
2017-11-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Small Business Development |
2017-11-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab640 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB640.pdf |