WI AB64 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 5.05 (11m) and 20.510 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: aids to counties and municipalities for certain special election costs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Aids to counties and municipalities for certain special election costs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-05-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-04-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab64 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB64.pdf |