WI AB64 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-14 - Published 11-23-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-14 - Published 11-23-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 348.25 (4) (intro.) and 348.26 (4) of the statutes; relating to: single trip permits for the movement of oversize mobile homes, manufactured homes, and modular homes. (FE)
Title
Single trip permits for the movement of oversize mobile homes, manufactured homes, and modular homes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-14 | House | Published 11-23-2011 |
2011-11-10 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-9-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 57 |
2011-11-08 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-8-2011 |
2011-10-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2011-10-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a cosponsor |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-09-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Elections |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-06-08 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-06-08 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2011-06-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-06-08 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-06-08 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2011-06-08 | House | Read a second time |
2011-06-02 | House | Placed on calendar 6-8-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-06-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-06-02 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2011-06-02 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2011-06-02 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Transportation |
2011-06-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-05-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-04-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-28 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation |
2011-03-28 | House | Introduced |