WI AB638 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 961.55 (8); and to create 20.115 (7) (gc), 94.55, 961.32 (3) and 961.55 (8) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: growing and processing industrial hemp, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Growing and processing industrial hemp, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Consumer Protection and take up (Y: 37 N: 54 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-20 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Consumer Protection and take up, Ayes 37, Noes 54 |
2014-03-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vruwink |
2014-02-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced |