WI AB637 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 5.84 (1); and to create 5.84 (1) (b), 5.91 (19) and subchapter VI of chapter 6 [precedes 6.981] of the statutes; Relating to: using an electronic voting machine to cast a vote with an in-person absentee ballot. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Using an electronic voting machine to cast a vote with an in-person absentee ballot. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-15SenateLRB correction (Assembly Amendment 12 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3)
2018-03-13SenatePrinted engrossed by the direction of the Senate Chief Clerk-5672
2018-03-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Elections and Utilities
2018-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-02-20HouseRules suspended
2018-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 3 adopted
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 12 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 adopted
2018-02-19HouseAssembly Amendment 12 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Brandtjen and Bernier
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 11 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 adopted
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 9 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 adopted
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 adopted
2018-02-20HouseRead a second time
2018-02-15HouseMade a special order of business at 1:27 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
2018-02-15HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-02-15HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 6, Noes 3
2018-02-15HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 6, Noes 3
2018-02-15HouseReport Assembly Amendment 11 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2018-02-15HouseReport Assembly Amendment 9 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2018-02-15HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 1
2018-02-14HouseExecutive action taken
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 11 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representative Brandtjen
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 10 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 9 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 8 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 7 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 6 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
2018-02-13HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler, C. Taylor and Zamarripa
2018-02-09HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representative Brandtjen
2018-02-07HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-02-06HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Brandtjen
2018-01-29HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brandtjen
2017-12-06HouseRepresentative Tittl added as a coauthor
2017-11-28HousePublic hearing held
2017-11-14HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
2017-11-14HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback