WI AB635 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 218.0125 (1) (b) and 218.0125 (7); and to create 218.0125 (1) (b) 1. to 7., 218.0125 (7) (c) 2. and 218.0125 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: reasonable compensation of a motor vehicle dealer by a motor vehicle manufacturer, importer, or distributor for certain motor vehicle service work.
Title
Reasonable compensation of a motor vehicle dealer by a motor vehicle manufacturer, importer, or distributor for certain motor vehicle service work.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:07 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Felzkowski withdrawn as a coauthor |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2017-11-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab635 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB635.pdf |