WI AB633 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 69.21 (1) (a) 1. and 69.21 (1) (b) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: copies of certain vital records. (FE)
Title
Copies of certain vital records. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Published 3-1-2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 157 |
2016-02-25 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | LRB correction |
2016-02-17 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-08 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2016-02-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive session held |
2016-01-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-20 | House | Representative Kahl added as a coauthor |
2016-01-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2016-01-05 | House | Introduced |