WI AB633 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Published 5-21-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Published 5-21-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 302.46 (2) of the statutes; relating to: using county jail funds for costs related to providing educational and medical services to county jail inmates.
Title
Using county jail funds for costs related to providing educational and medical services to county jail inmates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Published 5-21-2010 | |
2010-05-07 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-7-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 256 | |
2010-05-04 | Presented to the Governor on 5-4-2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-15 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on calendar 4-15-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-07 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-07 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-06 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-17 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-01 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations | |
2010-02-26 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-02-25 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-25 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-02-25 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-25 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-25 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on calendar 2-25-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-02-19 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-19 | Report passage recommended by committee on Corrections and the Courts, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-17 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-07 | Public hearing held | |
2009-12-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Corrections and the Courts | |
2009-12-18 | Introduced |