WI AB632 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 15.07 (5m) (d), 15.675, 20.235 (3), 38.50 (1) (e) 9. and 10., subchapter V (title) of chapter 39 [precedes 39.85], 39.85, 39.86, 39.87 and 227.01 (13) (yo) and (yp) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a Distance Learning Authorization Board and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a Distance Learning Authorization Board and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-05 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2016-02-05 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2016-01-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2016-01-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2016-01-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab632 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB632.pdf |