WI AB626 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.014 (1m) (a) and 29.016 (1) (b); and to create 29.016 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: establishing an open season for hunting deer with muzzle-loading firearms within the Apostle Islands National Lakeshore.
Title
Establishing an open season for hunting deer with muzzle-loading firearms within the Apostle Islands National Lakeshore.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Meyers [D] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R] |
Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Terry Moulton [R] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 298 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2018 |
2018-01-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2017-12-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-12-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced |