WI AB624 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 48.482 of the statutes; Relating to: driver's licenses for youth in out-of-home care and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's licenses for youth in out-of-home care and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseRepresentative Ohnstad added as a coauthor
2020-01-02HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-11-25HouseRepresentative Stubbs added as a coauthor
2019-11-21HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-11-21HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback