WI AB624 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 125.05; and to amend 6.47 (8) (e), 125.10 (3), 125.51 (5) (a) 1. and 139.11 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: retaining invoices for the sale of malt beverages and intoxicating liquors and the local option for issuing liquor licenses. (FE)
Title
Retaining invoices for the sale of malt beverages and intoxicating liquors and the local option for issuing liquor licenses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | House | Published 4-26-2016 |
2016-04-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-25-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 372 |
2016-04-21 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Local Government |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2016-01-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2016-01-04 | House | Introduced |