WI AB621 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-27 - Executive action taken
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 118.60 (2) (a) 2. c., 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. (intro.), 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. a. and 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. b.; and to create 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. am., 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. bm. and 118.60 (3) (ar) 6. cm. of the statutes; Relating to: the prior year pupil attendance requirement to participate in the Racine Parental Choice Program or the statewide parental choice program and allowing a pupil who changes residence to transfer from the Racine Parental Choice Program or Milwaukee Parental Choice Program to the statewide parental choice program. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The prior year pupil attendance requirement to participate in the Racine Parental Choice Program or the statewide parental choice program and allowing a pupil who changes residence to transfer from the Racine Parental Choice Program or Milwaukee Parental Choice Program to the statewide parental choice program. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-27HouseExecutive action taken
2021-10-22HouseRepresentative Wichgers added as a coauthor
2021-10-21HousePublic hearing held
2021-10-15HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-10-14HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2021-10-14HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback