WI AB621 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.377 (2) (intro.), 15.377 (2) (a), 15.377 (2) (b), 15.377 (2) (f), 20.255 (1) (d), 20.435 (1) (da), 20.435 (1) (hs), 20.866 (2) (zh), 46.295 (title), 46.295 (1), 46.295 (4) (intro.), 46.295 (4) (a), 46.295 (4) (b), 46.295 (5), 46.297 (title), 46.297 (1), 46.297 (2) (a), 46.298, 51.05 (6), 51.42 (7) (a) 6. a., 51.42 (7) (a) 6. b., 59.54 (5), 101.13 (1), 106.52 (1) (fm), 115.372 (1) (b), 115.372 (2), 115.372 (3) (b), 115.372 (3) (d), 115.372 (3) (e), 115.372 (3) (f), 115.372 (5), 115.51 (2), 115.52 (1m), 115.52 (2), 115.52 (3) (intro.), 115.52 (3) (a) 1., 115.52 (3) (a) 2., 115.52 (3) (a) 3., 115.52 (3) (b) 4., 115.52 (3) (b) 5., 115.52 (3) (b) 6., 115.52 (3) (b) 8., 115.52 (3) (b) 11., 115.52 (3) (b) 12., 115.52 (3) (c) 1., 115.52 (3) (c) 2., 115.52 (3) (c) 3., 115.53 (5), 115.54, 115.76 (5) (a) 2., 115.787 (3) (b) 4., 118.255 (1) (a), 459.01 (2), 459.01 (5), 459.10 (1) (q), 459.20 (3g), 459.20 (3p), 459.34 (2) (i), 632.895 (16) (a) 2., 632.895 (16) (b) 1. a., 885.37 (1), 885.37 (3) (b), 885.37 (5) (b), 905.015 (title) and 905.015 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: changing terminology for hearing loss and individuals who are deaf or hard of hearing.
Title
Changing terminology for hearing loss and individuals who are deaf or hard of hearing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-25 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2019-11-25 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2019-11-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-11-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab621 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB621.pdf |