WI AB62 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Published 2-1-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Published 2-1-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 120.13 (2) (g) and 185.983 (1) (intro.); and to create 632.722 of the statutes; Relating to: assignment of dental benefits under health insurance.
Title
Assignment of dental benefits under health insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Published 2-1-2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 1-31-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 91 |
2024-01-29 | House | Presented to the Governor on 1-29-2024 |
2024-01-17 | House | LRB correction |
2024-01-17 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-17-2024 |
2024-01-16 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Insurance and Small Business, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance and Small Business |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2023-11-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2023-11-06 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-10-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-09-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-09-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2023-06-14 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-04-11 | House | Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor |
2023-04-04 | House | Representative Binsfeld added as a coauthor |
2023-03-31 | House | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced |