WI AB62 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 40.02 (15) (c) 1. and 40.02 (15) (c) 5.; to amend 40.02 (15) (a) 3. and 40.02 (15) (c) 4.; and to create 40.02 (15) (c) 1g. and 40.02 (15) (c) 1r. of the statutes; Relating to: creditable military service under the Wisconsin Retirement System. (FE)
Title
Creditable military service under the Wisconsin Retirement System. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hebl |
2017-05-08 | House | Representative Jacque added as a coauthor |
2017-02-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-17 | House | Representative Pope added as a coauthor |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab62 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB62.pdf |