WI AB62 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-12 - Published 12-13-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-12 - Published 12-13-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.33 (1) (i), 30.50 (4e), 85.53 (1) (c), 350.01 (9), 939.22 (42) and 940.225 (5) (ai); and to create 23.33 (1) (gb), 30.50 (4c), 85.53 (1) (bg), 340.01 (20r), 340.01 (25d), 350.01 (4) and 939.22 (15) of the statutes; Relating to: the definition of intoxicant.
Title
The definition of intoxicant.
Sponsors
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Penny Schaber [D] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Dean Kaufert [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] |
Rep. Rob Swearingen [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R] | Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R] |
Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Dale Schultz [R] | Sen. Dale Schultz [R] |
Sen. John Lehman [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-12 | House | Published 12-13-2013 |
2013-12-12 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 12-12-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 83 |
2013-12-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 12-10-2013 |
2013-10-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2013 |
2013-10-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-10-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-05-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-07 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Read a second time |
2013-05-06 | House | Senator Jauch added as a cosponsor |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on calendar 5-7-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-05-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-04-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-04-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2013-03-07 | House | Introduced |