WI AB619 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.490 (3) (fq), 20.490 (3) (gq) and 234.665 of the statutes; Relating to: a revolving workforce home loan program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A revolving workforce home loan program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-12-08 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-11-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2023-11-08 | House | Introduced |