WI AB619 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 146.89 (2) (a), 146.89 (4), 165.25 (6) (b), 655.003 (3), 893.82 (2) (d) 1m. and 895.46 (5) (a); and to create 146.89 (1) (r) 5., 146.89 (2) (am), 146.89 (2) (br), 146.89 (3) (e) to (i) and 146.89 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing health care providers licensed outside the state to participate in and requirements on nonprofit agencies in the volunteer health care provider program. (FE)
Title
Allowing health care providers licensed outside the state to participate in and requirements on nonprofit agencies in the volunteer health care provider program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-01-24 | House | LRB correction |
2014-01-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2014-01-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab619 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB619.pdf |