WI AB619 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 36.60 (1) (ad), 36.60 (1) (ae) and 36.60 (3) (am); to amend 20.285 (1) (qj) (title), 20.505 (8) (hm) 6r., 36.60 (title), 36.60 (2) (a) 1., 36.60 (2) (b), 36.60 (3) (am), 36.60 (5) (b) 1., 36.60 (5) (b) 2., 36.60 (5) (b) 3., 36.60 (5) (b) 4., 36.60 (5) (b) 5., 36.60 (5) (d), 36.60 (6m) (intro.), 36.60 (8) (b), 36.60 (8) (d), 36.60 (8) (e), 36.60 (8) (f), 36.60 (8) (h), 36.60 (9) (intro.), 36.60 (9) (intro.), 36.60 (9) (a), 36.60 (9) (b), 36.60 (9) (c) (intro.), 36.60 (9) (c) 2., 36.60 (9) (c) 3., 36.61 (1) (ag) and 36.62 (1); and to create 20.235 (1) (dd), 20.235 (1) (jd), 20.235 (1) (kd), 20.505 (8) (hm) 6t. and 39.465 of the statutes; relating to: grants for dental students, and loan assistance for dentists, who agree to practice in dental health shortage areas, or to provide services to Medical Assistance recipients, in this state, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Grants for dental students, and loan assistance for dentists, who agree to practice in dental health shortage areas, or to provide services to Medical Assistance recipients, in this state, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Colleges and Universities |
2012-02-23 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab619 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB619.pdf |