WI AB619 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 7.19, 7.21 (1m), 11.21 (18) and 11.55 of the statutes; relating to: county, city, town, and village authority to create local elections boards and to regulate the financing of campaigns for county, city, town, and village offices; duties of municipal and county boards of election commissioners; and granting rule-making authority.
Title
County, city, town, and village authority to create local elections boards and to regulate the financing of campaigns for county, city, town, and village offices; duties of municipal and county boards of election commissioners; and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Gary Hebl [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] |
Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Joseph Parisi [D] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] |
Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Sen. Jim Sullivan [D] | Rep. Annette Williams [D] |
Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs | |
2010-04-16 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 53, Noes 44 | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-13 | Made a special order of business at 11:20 A.M. on 4-15-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-03-03 | Report passage recommended by committee on Elections and Campaign Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 3 | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing held | |
2009-12-29 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-12-17 | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Campaign Reform | |
2009-12-17 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab619 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB619.pdf |