WI AB618 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 115.297 (4) (b) 5.; to renumber and amend 118.125 (2) (d); to amend 115.28 (12) (a) 3., 115.297 (4) (a), 115.297 (4) (b) (intro.), 115.30 (1), 115.30 (2), 118.125 (2) (a), 118.125 (2) (g) 2. and 120.18 (1) (s); and to create 115.28 (61), 115.297 (4) (c), 115.297 (4) (d), 115.297 (7) and 118.125 (2) (d) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: the student information system, the disclosure of personally identifiable student data, and the disclosure of pupil records. (FE)
Title
The student information system, the disclosure of personally identifiable student data, and the disclosure of pupil records. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 57, Noes 37 |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:03 AM on 2-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 25 |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 6, Noes 5 |
2014-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2014-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2014-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Pridemore |
2014-02-10 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Pridemore |
2014-02-06 | House | Representative Klenke added as a coauthor |
2014-01-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-16 | House | Senator Leibham added as a cosponsor |
2014-01-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-10 | House | Introduced |