WI AB616 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.14 (3) and 343.16 (3) (a); and to create 343.16 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: application for and issuance of operator's license renewals by electronic means. (FE)
Title
Application for and issuance of operator's license renewals by electronic means. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Shelton |
2021-11-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-10-14 | House | Introduced |