WI AB61 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.336 (2) (b) and 29.336 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: rules that prohibit feeding deer in certain counties. (FE)
Title
Rules that prohibit feeding deer in certain counties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-03 | House | Representative Fields withdrawn as a coauthor |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 8, Noes 6 |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Milroy, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Stuck and Brostoff |
2017-03-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab61 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB61.pdf |