WI AB609 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 969.035 (3) (b) and 969.035 (6) (c); to renumber and amend 969.035 (3) (a), 969.035 (3) (c) and 969.035 (8); to amend 757.69 (1) (b), 969.035 (2) (intro.), 969.035 (2) (a), 969.035 (2) (b), 969.035 (3) (intro.), 969.035 (4), 969.035 (5), 969.035 (6) (a), 969.035 (6) (b), 969.035 (7), 969.035 (9) and 969.035 (10); and to create 969.035 (2) (c), 969.035 (3) (bm), 969.035 (6) (am), 969.035 (6) (cm) and 969.035 (12) of the statutes; Relating to: pretrial detention.
Title
Pretrial detention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 4 |
2020-01-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-11-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-11-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab609 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB609.pdf |