WI AB608 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 450.062 (intro.); and to create 450.03 (1) (i) of the statutes; Relating to: delegation of the practice of pharmacy and granting rule-making authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delegation of the practice of pharmacy and granting rule-making authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HousePublished 4-17-2018
2018-04-17HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 293
2018-04-12HousePresented to the Governor on 4-12-2018
2018-03-30HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-30-2018
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-03-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2018-03-20SenateRules suspended
2018-03-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-03-20SenateSenate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 14
2018-03-20SenateRead a second time
2018-03-20SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Hansen, Larson, Schachtner, Vinehout, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Risser, Ringhand, Miller, Shilling, Bewley and L. Taylor
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-03-15SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-03-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-03-12SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20HouseRepresentatives Vruwink and Barca added as coauthors
2018-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-02-20HouseRules suspended
2018-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20HouseRead a second time
2018-02-15HouseMade a special order of business at 1:20 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
2018-01-05HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-01-05HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 1
2017-12-20HouseExecutive action taken
2017-11-29HousePublic hearing held
2017-10-27HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2017-10-27HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback