WI AB607 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 234.01 (4n) (a) 3m. a. to d., 234.01 (4n) (a) 3m. e., 234.01 (4n) (b) 1., 234.01 (4n) (b) 2., 234.65 (1) (e), 234.65 (1) (f), 234.65 (1) (gm), 234.65 (1) (gp), 234.65 (2) (a) 2., 234.65 (2) (c), 234.65 (3) (a), 234.65 (3) (b), 234.65 (3) (d), 234.65 (3) (g), 234.65 (5) (b), 238.11 (3) and 238.11 (5) (b); to renumber 234.65 (5) (a), 234.65 (5) (c), 234.65 (5) (d) and 234.65 (5) (e); to renumber and amend 234.01 (4n) (a) 3m. (intro.), 234.01 (4n) (b) (intro.) and 234.65 (5) (intro.); to consolidate, renumber and amend 238.11 (5) (intro.) and (a); to amend 66.1103 (4m) (a) 2., 234.01 (4n) (a) 1., 234.01 (4n) (a) 3., 234.01 (4n) (a) 4., 234.65 (1) (a), 234.65 (1) (c), 234.65 (1) (g), 234.65 (1m), 234.65 (2) (a) 4., 234.65 (3) (intro.), 234.65 (3) (am), 234.65 (3) (dg), 234.65 (3g), 234.65 (3m), 234.65 (3r), 238.11 (1) and 238.25; and to create 234.65 (3) (bm) of the statutes; relating to: economic development activities of the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority.
Title
Economic development activities of the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-03-15 | House | Representatives Young, Barca and Bewley added as coauthors |
2012-03-06 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:40 A.M. on 3-13-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 |
2012-03-06 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Klenke |
2012-03-02 | House | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-03-02 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Krusick |
2012-03-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-02 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business, Ayes 9, Noes 1 |
2012-02-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-02-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-28 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2012-02-23 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2012-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business |
2012-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab607 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB607.pdf |