WI AB605 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 29.331 (1); to amend 29.331 (5) (a) and 29.351 (1r); and to create 29.241 (5), 29.241 (6), 29.331 (1) (b) and 29.563 (6) (a) 1s. of the statutes; Relating to: youth trapping, creating a mentored trapping license, restrictions on taking or appropriating a trap or its contents, and requirements for tagging traps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth trapping, creating a mentored trapping license, restrictions on taking or appropriating a trap or its contents, and requirements for tagging traps.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HousePublished 4-17-2018
2018-04-17HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 343
2018-04-12HousePresented to the Governor on 4-12-2018
2018-03-30HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-30-2018
2018-03-30HouseLRB correction
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-03-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2018-03-20SenateRules suspended
2018-03-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-03-20SenateRead a second time
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-03-15SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-01-17SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-01-17SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-01-16SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-01-16HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-01-16HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-01-16HouseRules suspended
2018-01-16HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-16HouseRead a second time
2018-01-11HousePlaced on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules
2017-12-19HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-12-19HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2017-12-06HouseExecutive action taken
2017-11-08HousePublic hearing held
2017-10-27HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage
2017-10-27HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback