WI AB601 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 301.48 (3) (b) and 301.49 (3) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: length of contracts for GPS devices for tracking sex offenders and persons who violated injunctions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Length of contracts for GPS devices for tracking sex offenders and persons who violated injunctions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HousePublished 4-17-2018
2018-04-17HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 346
2018-04-12HousePresented to the Governor on 4-12-2018
2018-03-30HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-30-2018
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-03-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2018-03-20SenateRules suspended
2018-03-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-03-20SenateRead a second time
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-01-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-01-12SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-01-11SenateExecutive action taken
2018-01-04SenatePublic hearing held
2017-11-14SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-11-09SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-11-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-09HouseRead a third time and passed
2017-11-09HouseRules suspended
2017-11-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-11-09HouseRead a second time
2017-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-11-07HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-11-07HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2017-11-07HouseExecutive action taken
2017-11-01HouseRepresentative Brandtjen added as a coauthor
2017-10-31HousePublic hearing held
2017-10-27HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Corrections
2017-10-27HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback