WI AB600 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 60.23 (32) (b) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: allowing the Town of Cable in Bayfield County to create a tax incremental district in the same manner as a city or village. (FE)
Title
Allowing the Town of Cable in Bayfield County to create a tax incremental district in the same manner as a city or village. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. Beth Meyers [D] | Rep. James Edming [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] |
Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 292 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-02-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-26-2018 |
2018-02-26 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2) |
2018-02-26 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-05 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2018-01-05 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 9, Noes 2 |
2018-01-05 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2017-12-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-12-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Quinn |
2017-12-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Quinn |
2017-11-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-10-27 | House | Introduced |