WI AB60 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 134.47 of the statutes; Relating to: requirements for adult-entertainment establishments and providing a penalty.
Title
Requirements for adult-entertainment establishments and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2024-01-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2023-12-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-12-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bodden |
2023-04-12 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2023-04-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2023-02-23 | House | Introduced |