WI AB60 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 118.163 (3m), 938.342 (3) and 938.355 (6m) (ac) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting the use of electronic monitoring for juveniles in truancy cases.
Title
Prohibiting the use of electronic monitoring for juveniles in truancy cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Amanda Stuck [D] | Rep. David Crowley [D] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] |
Rep. Don Vruwink [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-17 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2019-04-11 | House | Representative C. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2019-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab60 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB60.pdf |