WI AB60 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 230.06 (1) (n) and 230.08 (3) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: an employee in the classified service representing himself or herself as an engineer.
Title
An employee in the classified service representing himself or herself as an engineer.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Jason Fields [D] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] |
Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] |
Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-01 | House | Published 12-1-2017 |
2017-12-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 111 |
2017-11-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-03 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-3-2017 |
2017-10-31 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 2 |
2017-05-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2017-05-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Weatherston |
2017-03-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced |