WI AB599 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.285 (1) (g) and 36.46; and to create 20.285 (1) (g) and 36.46 of the statutes; Relating to: marketing of employment and training opportunities to former University of Wisconsin System students and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Marketing of employment and training opportunities to former University of Wisconsin System students and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2019-11-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab599 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB599.pdf |