WI AB599 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 48.355 (2b), 48.38 (1) (b), 48.38 (4) (fm), 938.355 (2b), 938.38 (1) (b) and 938.38 (4) (fm); to amend 48.028 (4) (g) 1. d., 48.07 (5) (c), 48.21 (5) (d), 48.235 (4) (a) 1., 48.235 (4) (a) 2., 48.235 (4m) (a) 1., 48.235 (4m) (a) 2., 48.236 (3) (b), 48.299 (4) (b), 48.315 (2m) (b), 48.32 (1) (b) 1. c., 48.32 (1) (c), 48.33 (4) (a), 48.33 (4) (c), 48.335 (3g) (c), 48.335 (4), 48.355 (2) (b) 5., 48.355 (2) (b) 6., 48.355 (2b) (title), 48.355 (2c) (b), 48.355 (2d) (b) (intro.), 48.355 (2d) (c), 48.355 (2e) (title), 48.355 (2e) (a), 48.355 (2e) (b), 48.355 (2e) (c), 48.356 (1), 48.357 (1) (am) 1., 48.357 (1) (c) 1., 48.357 (2v) (c), 48.363 (1) (a), 48.365 (2g) (b) 2., 48.365 (2g) (b) 3., 48.365 (2m) (a) 1., 48.365 (2m) (a) 1m., 48.365 (2m) (a) 3., 48.365 (2m) (ad), 48.365 (7), 48.371 (1) (a), 48.371 (1) (b), 48.371 (3) (intro.), 48.371 (4), 48.371 (5), subchapter VII (title) of chapter 48 [precedes 48.38], 48.38 (title), 48.38 (1) (am), 48.38 (2) (intro.), 48.38 (3), 48.38 (4) (intro.), 48.38 (4) (ar), 48.38 (4) (br) 2., 48.38 (4) (f) 3., 48.38 (4) (fg) (intro.), 48.38 (4) (fg) 5., 48.38 (4) (i), 48.38 (4m) (title), 48.38 (4m) (a), 48.38 (4m) (c), 48.38 (5) (a), 48.38 (5) (ag), 48.38 (5) (am), 48.38 (5) (bm) 2., 48.38 (5) (c) 2., 48.38 (5) (c) 5., 48.38 (5) (c) 6. (intro.), 48.38 (5) (c) 6. d., 48.38 (5) (c) 7., 48.38 (5) (d), 48.38 (5m) (title), 48.38 (5m) (a), 48.38 (5m) (b), 48.38 (5m) (c) 2., 48.38 (5m) (d), 48.38 (5m) (e), 48.38 (5m) (f), 48.38 (6) (a), 48.38 (6) (d), 48.417 (1) (a), 48.417 (2) (b), 48.417 (2) (c), 48.417 (2) (cm), 48.425 (1) (c), 48.43 (1) (c), 48.43 (1) (cm), 48.43 (2) (b), 48.43 (5) (a), 48.43 (5) (b) 1., 48.43 (5) (b) 2., 48.43 (5) (c), 48.43 (5m), 48.63 (4), 48.63 (5) (c), 48.63 (5) (d) 1., 48.63 (5) (d) 2., 48.63 (5) (d) 3., 48.63 (5) (d) 4., 48.63 (5) (d) 6., 48.831 (4) (e), 48.834 (1), 48.834 (2), 48.977 (3r), 48.977 (4) (e), 48.977 (4) (i), 49.471 (4) (a) 4. a., 49.471 (4) (b) 4. a., 146.82 (2) (a) 18m., 252.15 (3m) (d) 15., 757.69 (1) (g) 14., 767.41 (3) (b), 767.41 (3) (c), 808.075 (4) (a) 8., 808.075 (4) (fn) 8., 938.028 (4) (f) 1. d., 938.21 (5) (d), 938.235 (4) (a) 1., 938.235 (4) (a) 2., 938.315 (2m) (b), 938.32 (1) (c) 1. c., 938.32 (1) (d), 938.33 (4) (a), 938.33 (4) (c), 938.335 (3g) (c), 938.335 (4), 938.355 (2) (b) 5., 938.355 (2) (b) 6., 938.355 (2b) (title), 938.355 (2c) (b), 938.355 (2d) (b) (intro.), 938.355 (2d) (c), 938.355 (2e) (title), 938.355 (2e) (a), 938.355 (2e) (b), 938.355 (2e) (c), 938.356 (1), 938.357 (1) (am) 1., 938.357 (1) (c) 1., 938.357 (2v) (c), 938.363 (1) (a), 938.365 (2g) (b) 2., 938.365 (2g) (b) 3., 938.365 (2m) (a) 1., 938.365 (2m) (a) 1m., 938.365 (2m) (a) 3., 938.365 (2m) (ad), 938.365 (7), 938.371 (1) (a), 938.371 (1) (b), 938.371 (3) (intro.), 938.371 (4), 938.371 (5), subchapter VII (title) of chapter 938 [precedes 938.38], 938.38 (title), 938.38 (1) (am), 938.38 (2) (intro.), 938.38 (3) (intro.), 938.38 (3) (a), 938.38 (3) (b), 938.38 (4) (intro.), 938.38 (4) (ar), 938.38 (4) (br) 2., 938.38 (4) (f) 3., 938.38 (4) (fg) (intro.), 938.38 (4) (fg) 5., 938.38 (4) (i), 938.38 (4m) (title), 938.38 (4m) (a), 938.38 (4m) (c), 938.38 (5) (a), 938.38 (5) (ag), 938.38 (5) (am), 938.38 (5) (bm) 2., 938.38 (5) (c) 2., 938.38 (5) (c) 5., 938.38 (5) (c) 6. (intro.), 938.38 (5) (c) 6. d., 938.38 (5) (c) 7., 938.38 (5) (d), 938.38 (5m) (title), 938.38 (5m) (a), 938.38 (5m) (b), 938.38 (5m) (c) 2., 938.38 (5m) (d), 938.38 (5m) (e), 938.38 (5m) (f), 938.38 (6) (a) and 938.38 (6) (d); and to create 48.355 (2b) (a), 48.358, 48.38 (4) (fm) 1., 48.38 (5) (c) 6m., 938.355 (2b) (a), 938.358, 938.38 (4) (fm) 1. and 938.38 (5) (c) 6m. of the statutes; relating to: case planning for a child placed in out-of-home care, including concurrent permanency goals, trial reunifications, and planned permanent living arrangements for such a child. (FE)
Title
Case planning for a child placed in out-of-home care, including concurrent permanency goals, trial reunifications, and planned permanent living arrangements for such a child. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-08 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Kerkman |
2012-03-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Children and Families |
2012-02-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab599 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB599.pdf |