WI AB595 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 76.02 (7) and subchapter V of chapter 76 [precedes 76.90]; to renumber and amend 71.05 (6) (b) 50., 71.26 (3) (ym), 71.34 (1k) (n) and 71.45 (2) (a) 19.; to amend 20.913 (1) (b), 71.04 (4) (intro.), 71.04 (8) (c), 71.13 (2) (a) 3., 71.13 (2) (b), 71.17 (3) (intro.), 71.25 (6) (intro.), 71.25 (10) (c), 71.26 (2) (b) 10. d., 71.26 (3) (f), 71.63 (3) (c), 71.78 (1), 71.78 (2), 71.78 (4) (o), 73.01 (4) (a), 73.01 (5) (a), 73.03 (50) (d), 73.09 (2), 73.09 (4) (b), 73.09 (7) (a), 74.23 (1) (a) 2., 74.25 (1) (a) 2., 74.25 (1) (a) 3., 74.30 (1) (b), 74.30 (1) (c), 76.01, 76.02 (2), 76.04 (1), 76.07 (1), 76.07 (2), 76.13 (1), 77.255, 77.52 (7), 77.54 (61) (intro.), 77.59 (3), 77.59 (4), 77.61 (11), 77.65 (2) (g), 77.71 (2), 77.71 (4), 78.80 (3), 139.11 (4) (a), 139.11 (4) (b) (intro.), 139.38 (6), 139.82 (6) and 227.03 (1); and to create 71.01 (6) (j) 3. g., 71.01 (6) (j) 3. h., 71.05 (6) (b) 50. b., 71.22 (4) (j) 3. g., 71.22 (4) (j) 3. h., 71.22 (4m) (j) 3. g., 71.22 (4m) (j) 3. h., 71.26 (3) (ym) 2., 71.34 (1g) (j) 3. g., 71.34 (1g) (j) 3. h., 71.34 (1k) (n) 2., 71.42 (2) (j) 3. g., 71.42 (2) (j) 3. h., 71.45 (2) (a) 19. b., 71.78 (4) (t), 76.30 (2) (j), 77.61 (5) (b) 13., 77.71 (5), 77.73 (2m), 78.005 (13d), 78.39 (5f), 78.55 (5p), 78.64 (4), 139.01 (5p), 139.30 (8p), 139.75 (5p) and 168.01 (2s) of the statutes; Relating to: tax administration technical changes. (FE)
Title
Tax administration technical changes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2016-01-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-12-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-12-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab595 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB595.pdf |