WI AB592 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Representatives Moore Omokunde and Vining added as coauthors
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 49.46 (1) (a) 1m., 49.46 (1) (j), 49.47 (4) (ag) 2., 49.471 (6) (b) and 49.471 (7) (b) 1.; and to create 49.471 (6) (L) of the statutes; Relating to: extension of eligibility under the Medical Assistance program for postpartum women. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extension of eligibility under the Medical Assistance program for postpartum women. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-30HouseRepresentatives Moore Omokunde and Vining added as coauthors
2021-11-23HouseSenator Bewley added as a cosponsor
2021-11-18HouseRepresentative Andraca added as a coauthor
2021-11-17HouseRepresentatives Sinicki and Snodgrass added as coauthors
2021-11-03HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-10-25HouseRepresentatives Shankland, Hong and Krug added as coauthors
2021-10-18HouseRepresentative Armstrong added as a coauthor
2021-10-13HouseRepresentatives Allen and Conley added as coauthors
2021-10-04HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2021-10-04HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback