WI AB592 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - Published 3-17-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - Published 3-17-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 25.40 (1) (a) 3., 84.59 (2) (b), 341.10 (6), 341.27 (1) and 347.02 (5); and to create 341.10 (6m), 341.14 (4u) and 341.269 of the statutes; relating to: registration of former military vehicles.
Title
Registration of former military vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | Published 3-17-2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 135 | |
2010-03-02 | Presented to the Governor on 3-2-2010 | |
2010-02-26 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-02-23 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-02-23 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-23 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-23 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-23 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up | |
2010-02-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2010-02-23 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-02-23 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-23 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-23 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-23 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-23 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on calendar 2-23-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-17 | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-11 | Executive action taken | |
2009-12-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-12-03 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-20 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation | |
2009-11-20 | Introduced |