WI AB59 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts
Pending: Senate Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 801.14 (2), 801.15 (5) (b), 801.18 (12) (c) and 802.05 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: service of certain pleadings and other papers by electronic mail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Service of certain pleadings and other papers by electronic mail.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts
2019-06-20SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-06-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2019-06-20HouseRules suspended
2019-06-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-20HouseRead a second time
2019-06-18HousePlaced on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-05-08HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-05-08HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-04-11HouseExecutive action taken
2019-03-14HousePublic hearing held
2019-03-07HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback