WI AB589 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 15.407 (9) and 440.032; to amend 440.032 (3) (b) 3. and 905.015 (2) (intro.); and to create 15.405 (18) and chapter 471 of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of sign language interpretation services, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Regulation of sign language interpretation services, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-15-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-12-13 | House | Representative Wachs added as a coauthor |
2017-12-07 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-12-01 | House | Representative Zepnick added as a coauthor |
2017-11-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy |
2017-10-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab589 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB589.pdf |