WI AB588 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 285.72; to amend 20.370 (2) (ce) and 285.72 (title); and to create 285.72 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting the funding and use of the Sheboygan Kohler-Andrae air quality monitor. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting the funding and use of the Sheboygan Kohler-Andrae air quality monitor. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-12-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kremer |
2017-12-14 | House | Senator Craig added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-12-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2017-12-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-11-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations |
2017-10-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab588 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB588.pdf |