WI AB586 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 16.855 (9m) (b) 1. a. of the statutes; Relating to: qualified bidders on state projects. (FE)
Title
Qualified bidders on state projects. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-09-30 | House | Introduced |