WI AB586 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 767.461; and to create 767.34 (3), 767.41 (5m) and 767.451 (3r) of the statutes; Relating to: modifications to legal custody or physical placement contingent upon a future event.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifications to legal custody or physical placement contingent upon a future event.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-01-17SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-01-17SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-01-16SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-01-16HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-01-16HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-01-16HouseRules suspended
2018-01-16HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-01-16HouseRead a second time
2018-01-11HousePlaced on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules
2017-12-19HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-12-19HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 10, Noes 0
2017-12-06HouseExecutive action taken
2017-11-16HouseRepresentative Bowen added as a coauthor
2017-11-15HousePublic hearing held
2017-10-24HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families
2017-10-24HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback