WI AB583 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 77.54 (65) of the statutes; Relating to: a sales and use tax exemption for services performed during a disaster period by electric cooperatives or telecommunications utilities. (FE)
Title
A sales and use tax exemption for services performed during a disaster period by electric cooperatives or telecommunications utilities. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 290 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-30 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-30-2018 |
2018-03-30 | House | LRB correction |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:12 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Representatives Pronschinske, Barca, Shankland and Vruwink added as coauthors |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-24 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Quinn |
2017-12-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2017-10-24 | House | Introduced |