WI AB581 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 341.51 (2), 341.55 (1) and 341.55 (2); to amend 218.0114 (5) (c) and 340.01 (74t); and to create 218.0116 (1) (ns), 341.47 (1) (e) and 341.51 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: motor vehicle dealer and wholesaler facilities and licensure requirements, certain registration plates issued to motor vehicle dealers, distributors, or manufacturers, and creating and modifying administrative rules. (FE)
Title
Motor vehicle dealer and wholesaler facilities and licensure requirements, certain registration plates issued to motor vehicle dealers, distributors, or manufacturers, and creating and modifying administrative rules. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:29 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 3 |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-01 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-09-28 | House | Introduced |