WI AB58 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Published 11-21-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 893.82 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: service of notice of claim against state officer, employee, or agent.
Title
Service of notice of claim against state officer, employee, or agent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Published 11-21-2019 |
2019-11-20 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-20-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 29 |
2019-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-14-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-11-13 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-13-2019 |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-03-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced |