WI AB577 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 20.115 (4) (ap) and 93.485 of the statutes; Relating to: grants to support donation of farm and food products to food banks and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants to support donation of farm and food products to food banks and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-03-12SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 70, Noes 25
2018-02-20HouseRules suspended
2018-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 2 adopted
2018-02-20HouseRead a second time
2018-02-16HouseSenator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor
2018-02-15HouseMade a special order of business at 1:10 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
2018-01-24HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-01-24HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 6, Noes 3
2018-01-24HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2018-01-09HouseExecutive action taken
2018-01-04HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Krug
2017-12-21HouseRepresentative Tittl added as a coauthor
2017-12-20HouseRepresentative Pope withdrawn as a coauthor
2017-12-19HousePublic hearing held
2017-12-19HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-12-19HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug
2017-10-24HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection
2017-10-24HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback