WI AB577 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 29.228 (2); to amend 29.563 (3) (intro.); and to create 29.219 (2) (d), 29.219 (2m), 29.228 (2) (b), 29.228 (4m), 29.563 (3) (a) 4m., 29.563 (3) (b) 5m. and 29.563 (3r) of the statutes; relating to: requiring the Department of Natural Resources to issue one-day fishing licenses.
Title
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to issue one-day fishing licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Fred Clark [D] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] |
Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D] | Rep. Scott Gunderson [R] | Rep. Thomas Hixson [D] | Sen. Jim Holperin [D] |
Rep. Ann Hraychuck [D] | Rep. Dean Kaufert [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Sen. Alan Lasee [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Sen. Dale Schultz [R] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Rep. Scott Suder [R] |
Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. John Townsend [R] | Rep. Robin Vos [R] | Rep. Amy Vruwink [D] |
Rep. Mary Williams [R] | Rep. Ted Zigmunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-03 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg | |
2010-01-05 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-04 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-12 | Read first time and referred to committee on Fish and Wildlife | |
2009-11-12 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab577 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB577.pdf |